TNPSC - group 4 exam Answer key Result - 21-12-2014 - Tamilnadu public service commission - group 4 exam Key

Posted at 18:00 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
SHORT CUT METHODS FOR ALL COMPETITIVE EXAMS AND BANK EXAM :

SHORT CUT METHODS FOR ALL COMPETITIVE EXAMS AND BANK EXAM

SHORT CUT METHODS FOR ALL COMPETITIVE EXAMS AND BANK EXAM :

Posted at 08:55 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
QUANTITATIVE APTITUDE (OR) NUMERICAL ABILITY AND SHORT CUT METHODS :

TOPIC-WISE NUMERICAL ABILITY SHORT CUT METHODS :
LIST OF TOPICS COVERED: (PLEASE SEE FROM BOTTOM TO TOP FOR RANDOM SEQUENCE ORDER, BECAUSE ITS ORDER IS CHANGED) 
    TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS :


    QUANTITATIVE APTITUDE (OR) NUMERICAL ABILITY AND SHORT CUT METHODS

    QUANTITATIVE APTITUDE (OR) NUMERICAL ABILITY AND SHORT CUT METHODS :

    TOPIC-WISE NUMERICAL ABILITY SHORT CUT METHODS :
    LIST OF TOPICS COVERED: (PLEASE SEE FROM BOTTOM TO TOP FOR RANDOM SEQUENCE ORDER, BECAUSE ITS ORDER IS CHANGED) 
      TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS :


      Posted at 00:39 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
      ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND SHORT CUT METHODS :

      TOPIC-WISE ENGLISH LANGUAGE SHORT CUT METHODS :



      1. ABOUT ENGLISH LANGUAGE
      2. SYLLABUS OF ENGLISH
      3. COMPREHENSION TEST
      4. ANTONYMS & SYNONYMS
      5. COMMON ERRORS 1 - CORRECTION OF SENTENCES
      6. COMMON ERRORS 2 - CORRECTION OF SENTENCES
      7. FILL IN THE BLANKS
      8. MIS SPELT WORDS
      9. SHORT CUTS FOR ENGLISH
      10. REARRANGEMENT OF SENTENCES
      11. CLOZE TEST
      12. PHRASE REPLACEMENT
      LIST OF TOPICS COVERED: (PLEASE SEE FROM BOTTOM TO TOP FOR RANDOM SEQUENCE ORDER, BECAUSE ITS ORDER IS CHANGED)
      TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS


      ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND SHORT CUT METHODS MATERIAL FOR ALL COMPETITIVE EXAMS

      ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND SHORT CUT METHODS :

      TOPIC-WISE ENGLISH LANGUAGE SHORT CUT METHODS :



      1. ABOUT ENGLISH LANGUAGE
      2. SYLLABUS OF ENGLISH
      3. COMPREHENSION TEST
      4. ANTONYMS & SYNONYMS
      5. COMMON ERRORS 1 - CORRECTION OF SENTENCES
      6. COMMON ERRORS 2 - CORRECTION OF SENTENCES
      7. FILL IN THE BLANKS
      8. MIS SPELT WORDS
      9. SHORT CUTS FOR ENGLISH
      10. REARRANGEMENT OF SENTENCES
      11. CLOZE TEST
      12. PHRASE REPLACEMENT
      LIST OF TOPICS COVERED: (PLEASE SEE FROM BOTTOM TO TOP FOR RANDOM SEQUENCE ORDER, BECAUSE ITS ORDER IS CHANGED)
      TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS


      Posted at 00:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
      REASONING ABILITY AND SHORT CUTS :


       REASONING ABILITY TOPIC-WISE SHORT CUT METHODS
      AND EXPLANATION

      1. ANALOGY MATERIAL
      2. ALPHABETS
      3. BLOOD RELATION
      4. CLASSIFICATION
      5. CODING AND DECODING
      6. CODED INEQUALITIES
      7. DATA SUFFICIENCY
      8. DIRECTION TEST
      9. PUZZLE TEST
      10. RANKING - NUMBER RANKING
      11. SYLLOLOGYSM 

      LIST OF TOPICS COVERED: (PLEASE SEE FROM BOTTOM TO TOP FOR RANDOM SEQUENCE ORDER, BECAUSE ITS ORDER IS CHANGED)
      TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS :


      REASONING ABILITY AND SHORT CUTS MATERIAL FOR ALL COMPETITIVE EXAMS

      REASONING ABILITY AND SHORT CUTS :


       REASONING ABILITY TOPIC-WISE SHORT CUT METHODS
      AND EXPLANATION

      1. ANALOGY MATERIAL
      2. ALPHABETS
      3. BLOOD RELATION
      4. CLASSIFICATION
      5. CODING AND DECODING
      6. CODED INEQUALITIES
      7. DATA SUFFICIENCY
      8. DIRECTION TEST
      9. PUZZLE TEST
      10. RANKING - NUMBER RANKING
      11. SYLLOLOGYSM 

      LIST OF TOPICS COVERED: (PLEASE SEE FROM BOTTOM TO TOP FOR RANDOM SEQUENCE ORDER, BECAUSE ITS ORDER IS CHANGED)
      TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS :


      Posted at 00:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
      BANKING KNOWLEDGE FOR ALL BANK & COMPETITION EXAMS :


        BANKING KNOWLEDGE MATERIAL FOR ALL COMPETITIVE EXAMS

        BANKING KNOWLEDGE FOR ALL BANK & COMPETITION EXAMS :


          Posted at 00:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com

          COMPUTER KNOWLEDGE MATERIAL FOR ALL EXAMS

          Posted at 00:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
          MARKETING KNOWLEDGE


          TOPIC-WISE MARKETING KNOWLEDGE:


          MARKETING KNOWLEDGE MATERIAL FOR ALL COMPETITIVE EXAMS

          MARKETING KNOWLEDGE


          TOPIC-WISE MARKETING KNOWLEDGE:


          Posted at 00:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
          MORE MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS AVAILABLE HERE

          Square a 2 Digit Number Ending in 5

          For this example we will use 25
          • Take the "tens" part of the number (the 2 and add 1)=3
          • Multiply the original "tens" part of the number by the new number (2x3)
          • Take the result (2x3=6) and put 25 behind it. Result the answer 625.
          Try a few more 75 squared ... = 7x8=56 ... put 25 behind it is 5625.
          55 squared = 5x6=30 ... put 25 behind it ... is 3025. Another easy one! Practice it on paper first!
          SINGLE STEP: 35 square
          (3x[3+1]) / (5x5) = 12 / 25 = 1225
          Square 2 Digit Number: UP-DOWN Method 

          Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:
          • Look for the nearest 10 boundary
          • In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.
          • Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.
          • Now mentally multiply 34x40
          • The way I do it is 34x10=340;
          • Double it mentally to 680
          • Double it again mentally to 1360
          • This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.
          • 37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.
          • Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.
          • 3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.
          • Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.
          • Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369

          With practice this can easily be done in your head.
           
          Easy Multiplication By 11

          You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10, just add a 0 behind the number) but do you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head for any two digit number. Practice it on paper first!
          To multiply any two digit number by 11:
          • For this example we will use 54.
          • Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4).
          • Notice the hole between them!
          • Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9)
          • Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594. That's it! 11 x 54=594
          The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9, you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition. For example 11 x 57 ... 5__7 ... 5+7=12 ... put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12 to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 ... 11 x 57 = 627
          Practice it on paper first!

          Easy Multiplication By The 11 Rule Expanded

          You can directly write down the answer to any number multiplied by 11.
          • Take for example the number 51236 X 11.
          • First, write down the number with a zero in front of it.
          051236
          The zero is necessary so that the rules are simpler.
          • Draw a line under the number.
          • Bear with me on this one. It is simple if you work through it slowly. To do this, all you have to do this is "Add the neighbor". Look at the 6 in the "units" position of the number. Since there is no number to the right of it, you can't add to its "neighbor" so just write down 6 below the 6 in the units col.
          • For the "tens" place, add the 3 to the its "neighbor" (the 6). Write the answer: 9 below the 3.
          • For the "hundreds" place, add the 2 to the its "neighbor" (the 3). Write the answer: 5 below the 2.
          • For the "thousands" place, add the 1 to the its "neighbor" (the 2). Write the answer: 3 below the 1.
          • For the "ten-thousands" place, add the 5 to the its "neighbor" (the 1). Write the answer: 6 below the 5.
          • For the "hundred-thousands" place, add the 0 to the its "neighbor" (the 5). Write the answer: 5 below the 0.
          That's it ... 11 X 051236 = 563596

          Finger Math: 9X Rule Easy Multiplication By 9

          To multiply by 9,try this:
          (1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.
          (2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4, it would be the 4th finger and so on.
          (3) the answer is 27 ... READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.

          This works for anything up to 9x10!

          Multiply By 4

          To quickly multiply by four, double the number and then double it again.
          Often this can be done in your head.
          Multiply By 5
          To quickly multiply by 5, divide the number in two and then multiply it by 10. Often this can be done quickly in your head.

          Easy Multiplication Shortcuts for calculation & All Bank Exams

          MORE MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS AVAILABLE HERE

          Square a 2 Digit Number Ending in 5

          For this example we will use 25
          • Take the "tens" part of the number (the 2 and add 1)=3
          • Multiply the original "tens" part of the number by the new number (2x3)
          • Take the result (2x3=6) and put 25 behind it. Result the answer 625.
          Try a few more 75 squared ... = 7x8=56 ... put 25 behind it is 5625.
          55 squared = 5x6=30 ... put 25 behind it ... is 3025. Another easy one! Practice it on paper first!
          SINGLE STEP: 35 square
          (3x[3+1]) / (5x5) = 12 / 25 = 1225
          Square 2 Digit Number: UP-DOWN Method 

          Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:
          • Look for the nearest 10 boundary
          • In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.
          • Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.
          • Now mentally multiply 34x40
          • The way I do it is 34x10=340;
          • Double it mentally to 680
          • Double it again mentally to 1360
          • This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.
          • 37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.
          • Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.
          • 3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.
          • Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.
          • Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369

          With practice this can easily be done in your head.
           
          Easy Multiplication By 11

          You likely all know the 10 rule (to multiply by 10, just add a 0 behind the number) but do you know the 11 rule? It is as easy! You should be able to do this one in you head for any two digit number. Practice it on paper first!
          To multiply any two digit number by 11:
          • For this example we will use 54.
          • Separate the two digits in you mind (5__4).
          • Notice the hole between them!
          • Add the 5 and the 4 together (5+4=9)
          • Put the resulting 9 in the hole 594. That's it! 11 x 54=594
          The only thing tricky to remember is that if the result of the addition is greater than 9, you only put the "ones" digit in the hole and carry the "tens" digit from the addition. For example 11 x 57 ... 5__7 ... 5+7=12 ... put the 2 in the hole and add the 1 from the 12 to the 5 in to get 6 for a result of 627 ... 11 x 57 = 627
          Practice it on paper first!

          Easy Multiplication By The 11 Rule Expanded

          You can directly write down the answer to any number multiplied by 11.
          • Take for example the number 51236 X 11.
          • First, write down the number with a zero in front of it.
          051236
          The zero is necessary so that the rules are simpler.
          • Draw a line under the number.
          • Bear with me on this one. It is simple if you work through it slowly. To do this, all you have to do this is "Add the neighbor". Look at the 6 in the "units" position of the number. Since there is no number to the right of it, you can't add to its "neighbor" so just write down 6 below the 6 in the units col.
          • For the "tens" place, add the 3 to the its "neighbor" (the 6). Write the answer: 9 below the 3.
          • For the "hundreds" place, add the 2 to the its "neighbor" (the 3). Write the answer: 5 below the 2.
          • For the "thousands" place, add the 1 to the its "neighbor" (the 2). Write the answer: 3 below the 1.
          • For the "ten-thousands" place, add the 5 to the its "neighbor" (the 1). Write the answer: 6 below the 5.
          • For the "hundred-thousands" place, add the 0 to the its "neighbor" (the 5). Write the answer: 5 below the 0.
          That's it ... 11 X 051236 = 563596

          Finger Math: 9X Rule Easy Multiplication By 9

          To multiply by 9,try this:
          (1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.
          (2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4, it would be the 4th finger and so on.
          (3) the answer is 27 ... READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it.

          This works for anything up to 9x10!

          Multiply By 4

          To quickly multiply by four, double the number and then double it again.
          Often this can be done in your head.
          Multiply By 5
          To quickly multiply by 5, divide the number in two and then multiply it by 10. Often this can be done quickly in your head.

          Posted at 00:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com

        • MULTIPLICATION UP TO 20X20 IN YOUR HEAD
        • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100
        • Easy Multiplication Shortcuts for calculation & All Bank Exams
        • MORE MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUTS FOR MATHS or MATHEMATICS 
        • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100 FOR ALL EXAMS AND CHILDREN 

        • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100 FOR ALL EXAMS

          Multiplication Short cut methods use full for all exams. All the best

          MULTIPLICATION UP TO 20X20 IN YOUR HEAD
          • Take 15 x 13 for an example.
          • Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind.
          • Then draw the shape of Africa mentally so it covers the 15 and the 3 from the 13 below. Those covered numbers are all you need.
          • First add 15 + 3 = 18
          • Add a zero behind it (or multiply by 10) to get 180.
          • Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the "5" (3x5= 15)
          • Add 180 + 15 = 195. 
          15 X 13 = 195 
          MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100
           
          To multiply two numbers (of two or more digits), split each number into two parts. If the first number is a1 + b1 and the second number is a2 + b2, then the product of the two numbers is:

          (a1 x a2) + (a1 x b2 + b1 x a2) + (b1 x b2)
            
          Long Multiplication shortcut technique

          The solution comprises three parts (as shown by the boxes and arrows above): the head, the middle, and the tail.

          1. The digits on the right are multiplied vertically to get the tail part: b1 x b2 (excess carried over)
          2. All digits are multipled crosswise and added together to get the middle part: a1 x b2 + b1 x a2 (excess carried over)
          3. The digits on the left are multiplied vertically to get the head part: a1 x a2

          Here is a simple example to illustrate this technique.
          • 23 x 41 = 943
          Long Multiplication technique example

          The steps are:

          1. 3 x 1 = 3
          2. 2 x 1 + 3 x 4 = 14, put down 4 and carry over 1
          3. 2 x 4 = 8, plus the 1 carried over, is 9

          The speed gain using this technique (over the conventional method of multi-line long multiplication) becomes more apparent when handling larger numbers. Here is another example involving excess carryover at each stage.
          • 108 x 64 = 6912
           
          Long Multiplication technique example

          The steps are:

          1. 8 x 4 = 32, put down 2 and carry over 3
          2. 10 x 4 + 8 x 6 = 88, plus the 3 carried over, is 91; put down 1 and carry over 9

          MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100 FOR ALL EXAMS AND CHILDREN


        • MULTIPLICATION UP TO 20X20 IN YOUR HEAD
        • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100
        • Easy Multiplication Shortcuts for calculation & All Bank Exams
        • MORE MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUTS FOR MATHS or MATHEMATICS 
        • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100 FOR ALL EXAMS AND CHILDREN 

        • MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100 FOR ALL EXAMS

          Multiplication Short cut methods use full for all exams. All the best

          MULTIPLICATION UP TO 20X20 IN YOUR HEAD
          • Take 15 x 13 for an example.
          • Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind.
          • Then draw the shape of Africa mentally so it covers the 15 and the 3 from the 13 below. Those covered numbers are all you need.
          • First add 15 + 3 = 18
          • Add a zero behind it (or multiply by 10) to get 180.
          • Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the "5" (3x5= 15)
          • Add 180 + 15 = 195. 
          15 X 13 = 195 
          MULTIPLICATION SHORT CUT METHODS UP 100 X 100
           
          To multiply two numbers (of two or more digits), split each number into two parts. If the first number is a1 + b1 and the second number is a2 + b2, then the product of the two numbers is:

          (a1 x a2) + (a1 x b2 + b1 x a2) + (b1 x b2)
            
          Long Multiplication shortcut technique

          The solution comprises three parts (as shown by the boxes and arrows above): the head, the middle, and the tail.

          1. The digits on the right are multiplied vertically to get the tail part: b1 x b2 (excess carried over)
          2. All digits are multipled crosswise and added together to get the middle part: a1 x b2 + b1 x a2 (excess carried over)
          3. The digits on the left are multiplied vertically to get the head part: a1 x a2

          Here is a simple example to illustrate this technique.
          • 23 x 41 = 943
          Long Multiplication technique example

          The steps are:

          1. 3 x 1 = 3
          2. 2 x 1 + 3 x 4 = 14, put down 4 and carry over 1
          3. 2 x 4 = 8, plus the 1 carried over, is 9

          The speed gain using this technique (over the conventional method of multi-line long multiplication) becomes more apparent when handling larger numbers. Here is another example involving excess carryover at each stage.
          • 108 x 64 = 6912
           
          Long Multiplication technique example

          The steps are:

          1. 8 x 4 = 32, put down 2 and carry over 3
          2. 10 x 4 + 8 x 6 = 88, plus the 3 carried over, is 91; put down 1 and carry over 9

          Posted at 00:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
          NUMERICAL ABILITY AND SHORT CUT METHODS :

          TOPIC-WISE NUMERICAL ABILITY SHORT CUT METHODS :
          NUMERICAL ABILITY QUESTIONS TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS :


          NUMERICAL ABILITY QUESTIONS TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS :

          NUMERICAL ABILITY AND SHORT CUT METHODS :

          TOPIC-WISE NUMERICAL ABILITY SHORT CUT METHODS :
          NUMERICAL ABILITY QUESTIONS TOPIC-WISE DISTRIBUTION OF QUESTIONS ASKED IN PREVIOUS EXAM PAPERS :


          Posted at 00:33 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
          Official website for Apply  and download call letters
          www.ibps.in

          About Site:
          This site Specially designed for IBPS exam i.e CWE for all Banks

          This site Specially designed for IBPS exam i.e CWE for all Banks

          Official website for Apply  and download call letters
          www.ibps.in

          About Site:
          This site Specially designed for IBPS exam i.e CWE for all Banks

          Posted at 19:38 |  by www.ibpsexams.com
          Learn Squares and Cubes first for all competitive exams it is must and should learn Quickly

           SQUARE up to 100 and  CUBES up to 25


          SQUARE
          CUBES

          12
          =1
          512 = 2601
          13 =1

          22
          =4
          522 = 2704
          23 =8

          Y
          =9
          532 = 2809
          33 =27

          42
          = 16
          542 = 2916
          43 =64

          52
          = 25
          552 = 3025
          53 =125

          62
          = 36
          562 = 3136
          63 =216

          72
          =49
          572 = 3249
          73 =343

          82
          = 64
          582 = 3364
          83 =512

          92
          = 81
          592 = 3481
          93=729

          102 =100
          602 =3600
          103=1000

          112 =121
          612 =3721
          113 =1331

          122 =144
          622 =3844
          123 =1728

          1Y =169
          632 =3969
          133=2197

          142 =196
          642 =4096
          143=2744

          152 =225
          652 =4225
          153 =3375

          162 =256
          662 =4356
          163=4096

          172 =289
          672 =4489
          173 =4913

          182 =324
          682 =4624
          183=5832

          192 =361
          692 =4761
          193=6859

          202 =400
          702 =4900
          203=8000

          212 =441
          712 =5041
          213=9261

          222 =484
          722 =5184
          223=10648

          232 =529
          732 =5329
          233 =12167

          242 =576
          742 =5476
          243=13824

          252 =625
          752 =5625
          253=15625

          262 =676
          762 =5776


          272 =729
          772 =5929


          282 =784 ~.
          782 =6084


          292 =841
          792 =6241


          302 =900
          802 =6400


          312 =961
          812 =6561


          322 =1024
          822 =6724




          332 =1089
          832 =6889


          342 =1156
          842 =7056


          352 =1225
          852 =7225


          362 =1296
          862 =7396


          372 =1369.
          872 =7569


          382 =1444
          882 =7744


          392 =1521
          892 =7921


          402 =1600
          902 =8100


          412 =1681
          912 =8281


          422 =1764
          922 =8464


          432 =1849
          932 =8649 .


          442 =1936
          942 =8836


          452 =2025
          952 =9025


          462 =2116
          962 =9216


          472 =2209
          972 =9409


          482 =2304
          982 =9604

          I
          492 =2401
          992 =9801


          502 =2500
          1002 =10000

          I

          SQUARE up to 100 and CUBES up to 25

          Learn Squares and Cubes first for all competitive exams it is must and should learn Quickly

           SQUARE up to 100 and  CUBES up to 25


          SQUARE
          CUBES

          12
          =1
          512 = 2601
          13 =1

          22
          =4
          522 = 2704
          23 =8

          Y
          =9
          532 = 2809
          33 =27

          42
          = 16
          542 = 2916
          43 =64

          52
          = 25
          552 = 3025
          53 =125

          62
          = 36
          562 = 3136
          63 =216

          72
          =49
          572 = 3249
          73 =343

          82
          = 64
          582 = 3364
          83 =512

          92
          = 81
          592 = 3481
          93=729

          102 =100
          602 =3600
          103=1000

          112 =121
          612 =3721
          113 =1331

          122 =144
          622 =3844
          123 =1728

          1Y =169
          632 =3969
          133=2197

          142 =196
          642 =4096
          143=2744

          152 =225
          652 =4225
          153 =3375

          162 =256
          662 =4356
          163=4096

          172 =289
          672 =4489
          173 =4913

          182 =324
          682 =4624
          183=5832

          192 =361
          692 =4761
          193=6859

          202 =400
          702 =4900
          203=8000

          212 =441
          712 =5041
          213=9261

          222 =484
          722 =5184
          223=10648

          232 =529
          732 =5329
          233 =12167

          242 =576
          742 =5476
          243=13824

          252 =625
          752 =5625
          253=15625

          262 =676
          762 =5776


          272 =729
          772 =5929


          282 =784 ~.
          782 =6084


          292 =841
          792 =6241


          302 =900
          802 =6400


          312 =961
          812 =6561


          322 =1024
          822 =6724




          332 =1089
          832 =6889


          342 =1156
          842 =7056


          352 =1225
          852 =7225


          362 =1296
          862 =7396


          372 =1369.
          872 =7569


          382 =1444
          882 =7744


          392 =1521
          892 =7921


          402 =1600
          902 =8100


          412 =1681
          912 =8281


          422 =1764
          922 =8464


          432 =1849
          932 =8649 .


          442 =1936
          942 =8836


          452 =2025
          952 =9025


          462 =2116
          962 =9216


          472 =2209
          972 =9409


          482 =2304
          982 =9604

          I
          492 =2401
          992 =9801


          502 =2500
          1002 =10000

          I

          Posted at 13:39 |  by www.ibpsexams.com

          Menu

          Labels

          back to top